Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Colonial County Mutual As Subrogee Of Lisa Johnson, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Carolyn J. Noack, against Ricketts, Colt Dewayne, Zachry Holdings, Inc., represented by Randy E. Moore, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Terri T. Holder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerri T. Holder Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Ancillary Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Holder, Terri) | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Objection | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer with Jury Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.