Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yarberry, Samantha Laine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Yarberry, Cameron Edwards, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2019 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Uncontested (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.