Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cloughessy, Brian, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Ross, Paula, in the jurisdiction of Bell County. This case was filed in Bell County Superior Courts with Jack W. Jones, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2018 |
CategoryModification Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | ||
September 13, 2019 |
Docket LETTER/ANSWER FROM PAULA ROSS/DEANNA WHITESIDE |
||
September 05, 2019 |
Docket AFF OF SERVICE SERVED CN/R TO PAULA ROSS 08/21/19 Server- Attorney- MAIL TO ATTNY |
||
July 30, 2019 | Citation | ||
July 30, 2019 |
Docket FIRST AMENDED PETITION TO TERMINATE CHILD SUPPORT ARREARAGE BY WILLIE |
||
July 30, 2019 |
Docket CLERKS COPY OF CN/R-MAILED TO ATTNY 7/31/19 |
||
July 30, 2019 | Service | ||
July 22, 2019 |
Docket COVER LETTER REQUESTING SERVICE ON PAULA ROSS |
||
December 12, 2018 | Post-Judgment: Modification - Other (DC) (OCA) | ||
December 12, 2018 | Converted Case Dispostion Event - Case Clock Stopped |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.