Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Huntting, Richard W., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Jeremy Lanig D B A Liberty Plu,, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1 with MOTZ, PAUL A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOTZ, PAUL A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2020 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Consumer/Dtpa |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeNot Final |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 |
Motion In Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE S/PM |
||
May 18, 2023 |
Motion In Limine PLAINTIFFS FIRST MOTION IN LIMINE S/PM |
||
May 17, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
May 15, 2023 |
No Fee Documents (e-File) PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED EXHIBITS LIST |
||
May 15, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
May 12, 2023 |
Served Service Served Subpoena |
||
May 05, 2023 |
Amended Filing (e-File) LANIG -- DEFENDANT'S AMENDED LIST OF WITNESSES |
||
May 04, 2023 | Pre-Trial Hearing | ||
May 03, 2023 |
No Fee Documents (e-File) LANIG -- DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST (AND LIST OF DEMONSTRATIVE AIDS) |
||
May 03, 2023 |
No Fee Documents (e-File) LANIG -- DEFENDANT'S LIST OF WITNESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.