Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hisey, Kendall, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #2 with Mischtian, John M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMischtian, John M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2020 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #2 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 |
Docket **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. |
||
November 03, 2020 |
Docket **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 20 - 26 |
||
October 26, 2020 |
Docket DEFT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER |
||
October 26, 2020 | Converted Case Dispostion Event - Case Clock Stopped | ||
October 26, 2020 |
Docket SET ASIDE JUD NISI DISMISS |
||
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
September 24, 2020 |
Docket NISI is Filed - GAULT BAIL BONDS srv- 09/21/20 |
||
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - GAULT BAIL BONDS srv- | |
September 17, 2020 | Citation | ||
September 17, 2020 | Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.