Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Llc Breviloba, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against Arthur L Poston, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryCondemnation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED CO. COURT #1 | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NONSUIT W/OUT PREJUD /S/ JP | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 19/22 | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NONSUIT W/OUT PREJUD | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | EFILED PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUD | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To CO. COURT #1 | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | EMAIL IN FILE CONFIRMING ORDER SENT TO ATTORNEY | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | EFILED ATTORNEY REQUEST LETTER | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED CO. COURT #1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.