Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mo Bahrami, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Melissa Jo Mendez And All Occu, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2018 |
CategoryJp Appeal/All Other Filings |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 18/23 | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL /S/ JP 01/02/2019 | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED COUNTY COURT AT LAW | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL /S/ JP | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COUNTY COURT AT LAW #1 | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING JANUARY 2, 2018 | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING JANUARY 2, 2019 | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.