Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Douglas Benedict, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 2.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2016 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House2 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 17-15 | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 17-17 | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF SURETY | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - TERRY CHAPMAN BAIL BONDS srv- | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER INCREASING BOND $10000 | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI DOUGLAS BENEDICT | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | TERRY CHAPMAN BAIL BONDS | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI TERRY CHAPMAN BAIL BONDS | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.