Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Kyle Travis Sterry, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 2.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2015 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House2 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL 16-9 | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - KYLE TRAVIS STERRY srv- | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI KYLE TRAVIS STERRY | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER INCREASING BOND $3000 | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | QUIK RELEASE BONDING | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.