Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Douglas Prather, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Century 21 Premier Realtors, Christopher Hoskins, Jo Kimberli Kravitz, Aaron Kravitz, Aaron Kravitz And Jo Kimberli, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2015 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING CC AT LAW NO. 1 JULY 9,2019 9AM | |
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STORAGE BOX 17-9 | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STORAGE BOX 17/9 | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S NONSUIT AGAINST DEFENDANT'S | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON SUIT /S/ JP | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER & REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.