Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against Bridgestone Retail Operations, Market Heights Ltd A Texas Limited Partnership, Cole Mt Harker Heights Llc, Target Corporation A Minnesota Corporation, Campbell Properties Limited Partnership, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2015 |
CategoryCondemnation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF CHECK | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED county court at law | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 18/19 | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT /S/ RAD | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT /S/ RAD | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To county court at law #3 | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING OCTOBER 12, 2018 | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED jeanne guthrie | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | E FILE NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT COLE MT | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | E FILE DEFENDANT COLE MT HARKER HEIGHTS, TX, LLC'S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.