Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Shawn Hill, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2015 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED COUNTY COURT AT LAW | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL /S/ JP | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 17/12 | |
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL /S/ JP | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS W/ PREJUD | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COUNTY COURT AT LAW #1 | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTY COVER LETTER | |
September 17, 2015 | Docket Event | C is Filed - SHAWN HILL srv-09/14/15 | |
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED JEANNE GUTHRIE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.