Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Carlos Cavello Iii, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 2.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2015 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House2 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 15-31 | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - CARLOS CAVELLO III srv- | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | SET ASIDE JUDGMENT NISI | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT-SURETY'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFF | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI CARLOS CAVELLO III | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | AAARDVARK BAIL BONDS | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER INCREASING BOND $6000 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.