Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Navy Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Margaret J Musa-Hines, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2015 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | STORAGE BOX 16-24 | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED cc no. 1 to Jeannie | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGE'S DOCKET | |
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To ORDER OF DISMISSAL WO PRE | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO cc no. 1 to Jeannie | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS WITH OUT PREJUDICE | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | WSEQ is Filed - MARGARET J MUSA-HINES srv- | |
September 17, 2015 | Docket Event | C is Filed - MARGARET J MUSA-HINES srv- | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION MARGARET J MUSA-HINES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.