Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jackie Lee Brollier Iii, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2015 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 15-20 | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - JACKIE LEE BROLLIER III UNSERVED | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ALWAYS OPEN BAIL BONDS | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI JACKIE LEE BROLLIER III | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER INCREASING BOND $4000 | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.