Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Brian Kerola, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2015 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | CC OF NONSUIT TO ALL PARTIES | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 15-33 | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANT NONSUIT W/O PREJUD | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CIT is Filed - BRIAN KEROLA srv-na | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION BRIAN KEROLA | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND PLAINTIFF'S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.