Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Stevon L Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 16-2 | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSED | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - GIVE YOU A BRAKE BAIL BONDS srv- | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - STEVON L JOHNSON UNSERVED | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI GIVE YOU A BRAKE BAIL BO | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | GIVE YOU A BRAKE BAIL BONDS | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI STEVON L JOHNSON | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFF | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER INCREASING BOND $3000 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.