Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Imperial Structured Sttlmnts, Washington Sqr Financial Llc, filed a(n) Settlement Rights case against Allstate Assignment Co, Allstate Life Ins Co, Susan Huckabee, Susan M Huckabee A K A Et Al, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategorySettlement Rights |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 16-14 | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL STORAGE BOX 16-14 | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STORAGE BOX 16-14 | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DISMISSAL BOX 4 | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 15,2014 AT 9 AM | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DISMISSAL BOX 4 | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CT COORD | |
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event | FAXED JUDGES DOCKET SCREEN TO ATTY D.LITTLE/REQSTD | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | FAXED JUDGES DOCKET SHEET /D.LITTLE AS REQUESTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.