Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Sandra L Wood, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | CCM 8440/SANDRA WOOD S/REBECCA WILLARD 04/12/12 | |
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DEPEW/CLRK | |
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDG/SANDRA L WOOD, CCM 8440 | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO RD | |
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DEPEW/CLRK | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET | |
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION SANDRA L WOOD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.