Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Michael Cagley Jr, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2011 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 12-06 | |
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event | MTN TO DISMISS | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - MICHAEL CAGLEY JR srv- | |
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/ AFFIDAVIT | |
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI MICHAEL CAGLEY JR | |
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event | ALWAYS OPEN BAIL BOND (87) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.