Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bk, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against John Bishop, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 15-43 | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event | ORD ON PLNTFS ORIG PET FOR BILL RVW/S/RAD/6/23/14 | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 9647/JOHN BISHOP, SGD 02/22/12 | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDG/JOHN BISHOP, CCM 9647 | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DEPEWS DESK/CLERK | |
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event | PL'S MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.