Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against Infinity Loan Servicing Jp Future Llc Dba, Tax Appraisal Dist Of Bell Co, Priority Bank, Jeanette Cosper, Clifford Cosper, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 1.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2011 |
CategoryCondemnation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court House1 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STORAGE BOX 15-14 | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 15-14 | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | ORD FOR PAYMENT OF CLAIM /S/ESJ 08/22/2013 | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | CLAIM FOR AD VALOREM TAXES IN CONDEMNATION PROCEED | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED TAX AFFIDAVIT | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED JUDGE JOHNSON | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO JUDGE JOHNSON | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED LESLIE TAX OFFICE | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO LESLIE TAX OFFICE | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD FOR PMT NOT SIGN NOT FRM ESJ ATTCH TO ORD 7/27 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.