Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against Temple Economic Devlpmnt Corp, County Developers Inc, Temple Industrial Fndtn Inc, Extraco Bank Na, Texstar National Bank, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 2.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2011 |
CategoryCondemnation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court House2 |
Case Outcome TypeNot Final |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To co. coordinator | |
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | RTN GRN CARD FROM WARREN,DRUGAN & BARROWS /S/7/13/ | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD AUTH WITHDRAWAL OF CODEM AWARD/S/JM 6/28/12 | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COURT CO-ORD | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | COPIES OF SGN MOT TO WIDRAW MAIL TO ATTY SASE | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | HEAR SET FROM CT-CO-ORD 6/28/12 | |
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event | FILE RETURNED | |
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW CONDEMNATION AWARD/S/RAD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.