Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Licensing - Administrative case against Cesar O Ozuna, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2011 |
CategoryOccupational License |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeLicensing |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2013 | Docket Event | INTERLOCK RELEASE/S/JM/10/21/2013 | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | THIRD AMENEDED ORDER GRANTING OCC LICENSE | |
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | SECOND AMENDED ORDER GRANTING OCC LICENSE | |
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER GRANTING OCC LICENSE /S/ JM 10/18/12 | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | TEXAS DWI EDUCATION PROGRAM | |
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING OCC LICENSE | |
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR OCC DRIVER'S LICENSE | |
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 11-19 | |
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.