Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jeremy St George, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Jr'Z Kustoms, Herman J Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Agreement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeWant Prosecut |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | RTN MAIL VERONICA LEGARRETA ATTY AT LAW | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STORAGE BOX 14-29 | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DISMISSAL BOX 4 | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 15,2014 AT 9 AM | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DISMISSAL BOX 4 | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CT COORD | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | MNT TO COMPEL PRDCTN & INSPCTN OF DOCUMENTS | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | MNT TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PL'S RQST FOR DSCLSR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.