Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
A Delaware Statutory Trust, Nat'L Coll Stdt Loan Trst 2005, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Capetillo Cruz Sr, Capetillo Cruz, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DEPEW/CLK | |
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DEPEW/CLK | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT, TO RD | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | CIT is Filed - CAPETILLO CRUZ SR srv- 12/22/11 | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER, PRO SE | |
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | CIT is Filed - CAPETILLO CRUZ srv-12/02/11 | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PL'S ORIG PETITION,DISCLOSURE & ADMISSIONS REQUEST | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION CAPETILLO CRUZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.