Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Humeberto V Valenzuela, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGES DOCKET SHEET | |
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED TO JUDGE DEPEW | |
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event | DEF. NOTICE TO DEFENDANT CCM 9942 (H. VALENZUELA) | |
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event | MAILED COPY OF MOT AND ORD BK TO ATTY CASTRO | |
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT/S/RAD 07/01/2013 | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | PLNTFS MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To TO JUDGE DEPEW | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM JUDGE DEPEWS OFFFICE | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | FILED ACCOUNT STATEMENTS PER JUDGE (NOT SCANNED) | |
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DEPEW/UPSTAIRS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.