Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Tanja Carranza, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeSm |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED COURT | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COURT | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED TO CCOORD OFFICE | |
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | PL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF | |
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORAL HEARING / MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO TO CCOORD OFFICE | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MERGER OF CITIBANK(SOUTH DAKOTA)NA INTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.