Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Shannon M Michael, Usaa Federal Savings Bank, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2011 |
CategoryWrit Of Garnishment /Pettion |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeWant Prosecut |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STORAGE BOX 14-31 | |
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DISMISSAL BOX 2 | |
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGES DOCKET | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 15,2014 AT 9 AM | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DISMISSAL BOX 2 | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 2 OF DISMISSAL DOCKET | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CT COORD | |
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 4015/SHANNON MICHAEL, RETURNED, FORWARD | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WRIT/SHANNON M MICHAEL/CCM 4015/RESTRCTD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.