Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Xavier Hopkins, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2011 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL BOX 11-09 | |
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | NISI is Filed - XAVIER HOPKINS NOT SERVED | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI XAVIER HOPKINS | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- NISI XAVIER HOPKINS | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | FREEBIRD BAIL BOND (66) | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/ AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.