Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, Citibank, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Ernest W Bachus, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 16-15 | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CIVIL STORAGE BOX 16-15 | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 16-15 | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | CC OF NONSUIT TO ALL PARTIES | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT W/PREJU | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To JEANNE GUTHRIE | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT W/PREJUDICE | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND REQ TO CANCEL TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.