Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Buford Duncan, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 5489/BUFORD DUNCAN, SGD/STMPD 01/12/12 | |
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COURT COORDINATOR | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDG/BUFORD DUNCAN, CCM 5489 | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DEPEW/DESK | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DEPEW/DESK | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | PL'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO RD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.