Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Ban, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Jeanette Ochoa, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeSm |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED COURT | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COURT | |
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED COURT | |
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COURT | |
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CC OORD | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.