Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hd Supply Industrial Pvf Group, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Richard Grimes Castle, Bill Jones, William Adrian Jones Jr, Electri-Chef Grills, Roti-Chef Grills, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | DEF'S COPY RETURNED/UNABLE TO FORWARD | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 12-11 | |
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DEPEW CLERK | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR NON SUIT TO DEPEW | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DEPEW CLERK | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED COURT | |
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.