Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Samuel L King, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Robert M Redfern Et Al, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2011 |
CategoryJp Appeal/All Other Filings |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeWant Prosecut |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CC OF DISMISSAL TO ALL PARTIES | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To STORAGE BOX 14-28 | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DISMISSAL BOX 2 | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 15,2014 AT 9 AM | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DISMISSAL BOX 2 | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 2 OF DISMISSAL DOCKET | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CT COORD | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 2813/JAMES ENDICOTT/SGD 01/29/11 | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 2844/JAMES ENDICOTT/SGD 01/29/11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.