Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Suit On Debt case against Kirby E Bonheim, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2011 |
CategorySuit On Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 15,2014 AT 9 AM | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED CT COORD | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | *** File folder Given To TO CIVIL BOX 14-24 | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRATING PLAINTIFF'S MOT FOR NONSUIT | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE SEND TO ALL PARTIES | |
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ORD GRANTING MOT FOR NONSUIT | |
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event | PLNTF'S MTN FOR NON-SUIT W/O PREJUDICE | |
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CT COORD | |
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DISMISSAL BOX 2 | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 2 OF DISMISSAL DOCKET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.