Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Camilla A Hamilton, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 7093/CAMILLA HAMILTON/MAHAN SGD 03/06/10 | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDG/CAMILLA A HAMILTON, CCM7093 | |
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO GMB | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT W/EXHIBITS | |
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event | C is Filed - CAMILLA A HAMILTON srv-01/18/10 | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION CAMILLA A HAMILTON | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event | PL'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.