Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hudson & Keyse Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Michael W Schlee, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | DEF'S COPY OF NONSUIT RETURNED, VACANT, UNABLE TO | |
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING NON-SUIT | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | PL'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DISMISS DOCKET | |
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | C is Filed - MICHAEL W SCHLEE srv-na | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | PL'S ORIGINAL EPTITION W/DISCOVERY | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION MICHAEL W SCHLEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.