Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Applied Card Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Lloyd D Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PL'S NONSUIT, TO GMB | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | PL'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED DISMISS DOCKET | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DISMISS DOCKET | |
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | DEF'S ORIGINAL ANSWER, PRO SE | |
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event | C is Filed - LLOYD D JOHNSON | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION LLOYD D JOHNSON | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | PL'S ORIGINAL PETITION W/DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.