Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, Hudson & Keyse Llc, filed a(n) Suit On Credit Cards case against James E Thrasher Jr, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Credit Cards |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
|
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeWant Prosecut |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 09-06 | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DISMISS DOCKET | |
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT, TO GMB | |
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event | PL'S MTN FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event | DEF'S ORIGINAL ANSWER, PRO SE | |
October 04, 2006 | Docket Event | C is Filed, JAMES E THRASHER JR | |
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION JAMES E THRASHER JR | |
September 29, 2006 | Docket Event | PL'S ORIG PETITION W/DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.