Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nco Portfolio Management Inc, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Loyd D Folz, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2006 |
CategoryArbitration Award |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOT OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF ATTY IN CHARGE | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- ABSTRACT LOYD D FOLZ | |
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event | SRV MEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT AFF | |
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDG CONFIRMING ARB AWARD | |
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event | CERT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event | C is Filed, LOYD D FOLZ | |
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event | PL'S APP/CONFIRM ARB AWARD | |
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION LOYD D FOLZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.