Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against Wilma Robinson, Richard A Robinson, Northwest Home Bldrs Inc, Northwest Home Bldrs Inc Et Al, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 2.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2006 |
CategoryCondemnation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court House2 |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT | |
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COURT | |
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COORD | |
August 26, 2009 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 5708/BARRON & ADLER/S WOODROW SGD 06/27 | |
June 19, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING W/DRAWAL OF AWARD, SGD JM | |
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE | |
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event | DEF'S MTN TO WITHDRAW AWARD OF SPECIAL COMM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.