Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Cathy Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeWant Prosecut |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO BOX 09-06 | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED. | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CO-ORD | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MTN TO RETAIN ON DOCKET, ORDER, RETURNED/UNSIGNED | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO DISMISS DOCKET | |
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MTN/SUMMARY JUDG, SGD GMB | |
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED COURT | |
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO COURT | |
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING, SET FOR HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.