Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Shaun E Drake, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STORAGE BOX 16-52 | |
September 18, 2006 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- ABSTRACT SHAUN E DRAKE | |
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE CCM#2035/SHAUN DRAKER/RETURNED, UNCLAIMED | |
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDG TO DEF, CCM#2035 | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | CERT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO GMB | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | AFF FOR ATTY'S FEES | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | SERV MEMBERS CIV RELIEF AFF | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | AFF OF ACCOUNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.