Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Usa Bank, Unifund Ccr Partners Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Nancy J Tischler, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeOtherdispos. |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STORAGE BOX 16-52 | |
October 10, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY/NANCY J TISCHLER | |
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event | PULLED FOR CRT | |
July 28, 2006 | Docket Event | SENT BACK TO JUDG-ANSWER FILED | |
July 26, 2006 | Docket Event | PL'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDG W/AFFS | |
July 26, 2006 | Docket Event | SUMMARY JUDGMENT, TO GMB | |
July 13, 2006 | Docket Event | PL'S CERT OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | DEF'S ORIG ANSWER, PRO SE | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | C is Filed, NANCY J TISCHLER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.