Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bella Charca Property Owners, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Ortiz-Vergara, Xavier, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Cooke, Bill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims Suits |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2022 |
Returned Mail Undeliverable ENV RETURNED/RTS NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UTF/JO |
||
June 27, 2022 |
Judge's Docket Sheet COURT CALLED AT 2:30PM WITH NO ONE HERE. COURT DISMISSES CASE WITHOUT FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION TRCP 165a, ORDER SIGNED AND MAILED. LP |
||
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Small Claims 2:30PM DWOP Judge: Cooke, Bill |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable ENV RETURNED/RTS NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UTF/JO |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 165A NOTICE ISSUED AND MAILED. LP |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry SENT 165A LETTER TO PLTS. LP |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry EMAILED NALLELY TO CK STATUS OF CASE. LP |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry SVC PAPERS RETURNED FROM CONSTABLES OFFICE WITH EMAIL FROM PLTS REP WITH NOTE ON SVC PAPER:IS DEPLOYED UNTIL OCTOBER.LP |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Service | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry SUIT AMT $1,709.50, $111.00 CC/CIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.