Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lumber Company Killeen Ltd, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Faubion, Jerry, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Cooke, Bill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2015 |
CategoryDebt Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2022 |
Returned Mail Undeliverable ENV RETURNED/RSTS NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UTF/JO |
||
May 24, 2022 |
Returned Mail Undeliverable ENV RETURNED/RTS NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UTF/JO |
||
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Small Claims 2:30PM DWOP Judge: Cooke, Bill |
|
May 16, 2022 |
Docket Entry CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDER SIGNED, MAILED & EMAILED. LP |
||
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable ENV RETURNE/DRTS NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UTF/JO |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 165A NOTICE ISSUED AND MAILED LP |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Debt Claim 2:30PM DWOP Judge: Cooke, Bill |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry SENT 165A LETTER TO PLTS ATTY. LP |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry CALLED ATTYS OFFICE-THEN EMAILED COPY OF PETITION TO THEM.LP |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry SUIT AMT $3,054.48, $750.00 AF, $43.00 CC(EFILED) CALLED ATTYS OFFICE LET THEM KNOW CIT/PET READY TO BE PICK -ED UP. LP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.