Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Mester, Violeta S, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Johnson, Gregory D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, Gregory D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt Collection |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Appoint Receiver - Approved | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
RECEIVERSHIP - JENKINS & YOUNG
Judge: Johnson, Gregory D. |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NOTICE/ENVELOPE |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (e-File) Proposed Order Appointing Receiver |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for Appointment of Receivership Plaintiff's Application to Appoint Receiver |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Instruction Letter |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing JENKINS & YOUNG Judge: Johnson, Gregory D. |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment MOTION FOR DEFAULT JGMT |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Default Judgment ORDER FOR DEFAULT JGMT |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address CLKA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.