Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hamilton, Lewanna, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Folkerson, Doug, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Johnson, Gregory D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims Suits |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2022 | Judgment | ||
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket DWOP Judge: Johnson, Gregory D. |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry DEF APPEARED FILED WRITTEN ANSWER OF DENIAL.YS |
|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry CIT SVD 3-30-15. YS |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Service | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | New Case Filed (OCA) | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.