Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Johnson, Gregory D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDebt Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket DWOP Judge: Johnson, Gregory D. |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR NON-SUIT | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing DWOP |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry MAILED FILEMARKED COPY BACK TO EZ MESSENGER IN SASE DCS DEF FILED ANSWER OF DENIAL DCS |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry REC`D AFFIDAVIT OF SVC MADE FROM EZ MESSENGER DCS |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry DEF APPEARED PRESENTED DEFENDANT`S ORIGINAL ANSWER. DEF WAS GIVEN 2 COPIES AND WAS ADVISED TO KEEP ONE FOR HERSELF AND SEND 1 TO THE ATTORNEY LISTED ON THE PAPERWORK. REM |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Service | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry MAILED CITATION AND RECEIPT BACK TO EZ MESSENGER IN SASE DCS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.